Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Status as Surviving Spouse
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Benson, Feldman, Smith, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured who becomes a surviving spouse based solely on the insured's change in marital status.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0191
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367771/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Status as Surviving Spouse
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {367771/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Homeowner's Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Status as Surviving Spouse
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Economic Matters 47
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Text - Chapter - Homeowner's Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Status as Surviving Spouse
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM