Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Carozza, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Gallion, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lam, McCray, Reilly, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force to investigate and study ways to increase the procurement of locally grown foods in State contracts and to promote participation by Maryland farmers in the process; providing for the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0305
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement - Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Procurement - Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM