Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Benson, Guzzone, Kelley, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Pinsky, Raskin, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman Pilot Program in the Office of the Attorney General; providing that the purpose of the Pilot Program is to investigate in specified counties whether the needs of children and families are being met by local departments, the rights of children and families are being upheld, and children under the jurisdiction of local departments are being protected from abuse and neglect; requiring the Governor to provide funds in the State budget for the Office to employ specified staff; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1022
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528178/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528178/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {768776/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {528178/1 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {528178/1 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {768776/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501 through 6-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM