Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Overdose Response Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Brinkley, Madaleno, Montgomery, Astle, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Mathias, Middleton, Pipkin, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for an Overdose Response Program overseen by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; requiring the Department to adopt regulations and authorizing the Department to take other actions; specifying the requirements an individual must meet to qualify for a specified certificate; authorizing a certified individual to receive a prescription for naloxone and supplies, possess prescribed naloxone and paraphernalia, and administer naloxone, under specified circumstances, to specified individuals; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0890
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {287271/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {226782/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {287271/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 55A
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {226782/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3101 through 13-3109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM