Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Charity) Beer, Wine and Liquor License
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing in Calvert County a special event (charity) beer, wine and liquor (on-sale) license; specifying the type of organization or group of individuals to which the Board of License Commissioners may issue the license, subject to limitations; specifying that the license authorizes a holder to hold and sell alcoholic beverages at a specified event to benefit a person or organization in dire need of financial assistance; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) {403226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Dyson) Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 39
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) {403226/1 Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 42
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 45
House 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM