Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a County Commissioner of Calvert County to participate in the Calvert County Employees Retirement Savings Plan; altering the salaries of the Sheriff of Calvert County, Orphan's Court Judges for Calvert County, and Calvert County Treasurer; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 42
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 47
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM