Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly or willfully removing or taking a firearm from the possession, custody, or control of a lawful owner without permission; prohibiting a person from receiving, possessing, transferring, buying, or concealing a firearm under specified circumstances; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; requiring a conviction for a violation of the Act to merge for sentencing purposes into a specified conviction for theft under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2016 Text - First - Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM