Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Issuance, Transfer, and Expiration
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a marketplace license in the 43rd alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City; creating exceptions under which the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City may issue certain new Class B-D-7 licenses; authorizing the Board to issue a Class BWLT beer, wine, and liquor (on premises) tasting license to a holder of a Class A-7 license only in a certain location; specifying that certain Class B-D-7 licenses are considered to be unexpired until the end of July 1, 2019, for a certain purpose in Baltimore City; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of License
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363296/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of License
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed 61
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of License
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61A
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {363296/1 Adopted 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 68
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Issuance, Transfer, and Expiration
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Issuance, Transfer, and Expiration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1001.1, 12-102, 12-1308, 12-1603, 12-1705, 12-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM