Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsored by
Senators Brinkley and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Frederick County; providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the incumbent Sheriff during a specified term of office; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0485
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Gutierrez) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Gutierrez) {703227/1 Rejected
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-12)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Second Reading Passed 37
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 39
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 41
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Gutierrez) Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Gutierrez) {703227/1 Rejected 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (119-12) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM