Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Employee Rights - Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower Law
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, Madaleno, Manno, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making specified provisions of law that relate to the Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower Law applicable to the University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, and Baltimore City Community College; requiring specified boards of specified public institutions of higher education to adopt specified regulations; requiring that specified personnel actions be made in a specified manner; providing for specified options for specified complaint or grievance procedures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0813
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-201, 5-202, 5-203, 5-204 through 5-209, 5-210 through 5-212, 5-213, 5-214, 5-215, 5-301, 5-302, 5-303, 5-304, 5-305, 5-306, 5-307, 5-308, 5-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM