Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the funding sources for and clarifying the uses of the State Wildlife and Management Protection Fund; clarifying that a 3-day nonresident hunting license does not authorize bear hunting; increasing the fees for specified hunting licenses; repealing a requirement that the Department of Natural Resources use specified funds for the processing of deer meat for the needy; repealing specified hunting requirements and restrictions; altering the distribution of specified fines for hunting violations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184032/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184032/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {184032/1 46
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 46
Senate 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {184032/1 Report Adopted 46A
Senate 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46A
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 49
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 51
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1102, 10-209, 10-301, 10-301.1, 10-308, 10-415 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM