Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery and Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a store from distributing plastic disposable carryout bags to a customer at the point of sale; requiring a store to charge and collect a 10-cent fee for each paper disposable carryout bag the store provides to a customer; authorizing a store to retain a specified amount of a specified fee under specified circumstances; prohibiting a store from advertising or stating specified information under specified circumstances; requiring a store to include specified information on specified receipts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0551
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance 20
Senate 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM