Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Conway, Currie, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Raskin, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring employers to keep wage records for each pay period for at least 3 years; expanding the types of wage records that employers are required to keep for each pay period; requiring employers to give employees a specified written notice within 1 week after the first date of employment; expanding the information that employers are required to give to employees at the time of hiring and for each pay period; requiring employers to provide employees with an explanation of how wages were calculated; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/24/2016 2/25/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-424, 3-427, 3-504, 3-507.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM