Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Employment Assistance for Veterans
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, Edwards, Muse, Peters, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Expanding the responsibility of service centers established by the Department of Veterans Affairs; requiring the Department to provide veterans with employment-related services; specifying the types of employment-related services provided to veterans; requiring the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to develop, in consultation with the Board of Trustees and the Veterans Commission, a program to reduce unemployment among veterans by assisting specified businesses to attract, hire, train, and retain specified veterans; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-904, 9-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM