Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Currie, Madaleno, Pinsky, Robinson, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to make available to specified service providers, local administering agencies for specified service providers and county boards of education specified supplies of feminine hygiene products for female residents in shelters and specified homeless female students; requiring specified feminine hygiene products to be made available free; requiring each county board of education to make available, in a specified manner, feminine hygiene products to homeless female students; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {817972/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {835865/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {817972/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Ways and Means Appropriations 46
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {835865/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Text - Chapter - Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM