Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - Studies
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Colburn, Jones-Rodwell, Klausmeier, Mathias, Montgomery, Muse, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to study the creation of a potential Pay It Forward Pilot Program; requiring the study to consider specified items; requiring the Board of Regents to study whether public institutions of higher education could successfully implement specified tuition freeze programs; and requiring the Board of Regents to report its findings and recommendations on the potential programs on or before December 31, 2014.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0853
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM