Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options (Full Medical Disclosure Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring physicians, under specified circumstances, to provide a pregnant woman the opportunity to view the active ultrasound image of the embryo or fetus before the performance or inducement of an abortion; and requiring a physician to allow the pregnant woman to view the ultrasound image at no additional charge.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0158 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM