Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from intentionally using excessive force; requiring a law enforcement officer to intervene to prevent another officer's use of excessive force; prohibiting a law enforcement officer from intentionally refusing to promptly provide or make a reasonable effort to obtain medical treatment for a person injured by a police officer's use of excessive force; requiring a law enforcement officer to make an immediate report to a superior regarding certain actions of another law enforcement officer; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0139
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {248078/1
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {248078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {248078/1 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Committee Amendment {248078/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judiciary 19 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-801 through 10-805 )
(   3-207,   3-212,   3-523, 3-801 through 3-805 )
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 10:03 AM
Click to return on the top page