Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Manno, and Garagiola
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Energy Administration to create a Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program to authorize qualified contractors to provide residential renewable energy installations and residential energy efficiency measures to residential property owners under specified regulated sustainable energy contracts; stating the intent of the General Assembly; requiring the Administration to manage, supervise, and administer a specified Program and to ensure that financing complies with specified provisions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0621
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0995 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417672/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {417672/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201, 14-202 )
(   9-20C-01 through 9-20C-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM