Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maintenance of Effort Requirement - Alteration and Study
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Ready, Reilly, and Serafini
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Excluding from a specified calculation the cost to provide building features required under accessibility laws; requiring the State Board of Education in collaboration with county governing bodies and county boards of education, to study specified issues relating to a specified application process and the use of specified financing mechanisms by county boards of education; requiring the State Board to make a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1079
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {429632/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {429632/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM