Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland to review the need for additional funding, training, and other resources necessary to increase diversity and inclusion in the tourism industry in the State; providing for the composition, chair and staffing of the Task Force; and requiring the Task Force to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2021.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1387
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {857078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {857078/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page