Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain utility, on presentation of certain documents and without requiring certain information or imposing a fee or penalty, to temporarily keep a certain account open for a certain period of time or transfer a certain account to a surviving spouse under certain circumstances; and authorizing a certain utility to impose a fee or penalty or terminate an account for nonpayment under certain circumstances or close a certain account under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {537778/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {537778/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Economic Matters 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Text - Chapter - Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:13 PM
Click to return on the top page