Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Vehicle Registration Fee Surcharge
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipal corporation to impose, by ordinance or resolution, an annual vehicle registration fee surcharge for the registration of a classified vehicle; providing that the surcharge may not exceed $20; requiring that revenue from the surcharge be used for specified transportation development purposes; providing that a municipal corporation may not impose a surcharge that is greater than a specified amount if the county that the municipal corporation is located in imposes a surcharge; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-118, 12-120, 13-938, 13-956 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM