Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the authority of the Department of Natural Resources to allow deer hunting on specified Sundays does not apply in Kent County; and authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt deer on private property on Sundays in Kent County throughout all deer hunting seasons, subject to specified provisions of law and specified time restrictions.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0312
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164838/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {164838/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM