Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival Permit
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Comptroller to grant a distillery off-site permit to a holder of a Class 1 distillery license or a Class 9 limited distillery license for specified purposes under specified circumstances; establishing limitations on the times and locations that distillery off-site permits may be used in a year; requiring the distillery off-site permit holder to notify the Comptroller of the permit holder's intention to attend an event within a time period that the Comptroller determines; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0911 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744437/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873198/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {744437/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 3/19/2016 3/19/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {873198/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-129, 2-132.1, 2-132.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM