Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Carter, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Gallion, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Hester, Hettleman, Hough, Jennings, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Miller, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council to study and make recommendations to the Governor's Grants Office and the Department of Budget and Management regarding the grants life cycle, including the creation of certain materials for use by certain grant-making agencies, grant applicants, and grant recipients, certain regulations, and certain recommended timelines and deadlines; requiring the Council to solicit the input of certain stakeholders and establish certain working groups; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704933/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {806984/1
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {806984/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {376681/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {704933/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {806984/1 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {806984/1 Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {376681/1 Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Text - Chapter - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:14 PM
Click to return on the top page