Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified retail service stations constructed or expanded after a specified date to meet specified requirements; requiring a person constructing a specified retail service station on or after October 1, 2014, to apply to the Department of the Environment for a setback certification; requiring the Department to issue a setback certification if a specified retail service station meets specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101 through 6-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM