Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Student Loan Payments
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Colburn, Feldman, Jones-Rodwell, King, Klausmeier, Mathias, Montgomery, Muse, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified taxpayer a credit against the State income tax for up to 50% of the qualified student loan payments made by the taxpayer during the taxable year; providing that the credit may not exceed the lesser of 20% of the average annual tuition during the taxable year at all institutions of higher education or $2,500; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0885
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM