Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental Entities
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Feldman, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a governmental entity notify the State Board of Elections if a person doing public business with the governmental entity fails to file a specified statement; requiring a specified governmental entity to provide the State Board with specified information; authorizing the governmental entity to comply with a specified provision of the Act by sending a specified quarterly report to the State Board no later than 10 business days after the close of each calendar quarter; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0118
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {425769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental Entities
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental Entities
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Ways and Means 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {425769/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental Entities
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental Entities
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM