Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Brinkley, Currie, Colburn, Edwards, Jones-Rodwell, King, Manno, McFadden, and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a State cost share formula for county library capital projects that receive State funding and setting a minimum and a maximum State cost share percentage.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0685
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {169434/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-15)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {169434/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 47
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (124-15) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-510 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM