Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals Process
Sponsored by
Senator Glassman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals Process; establishing the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Governor to designate the chair of the Task Force; providing for the staffing for the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation; requiring that the Task Force issue a report by January 1, 2015; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0674
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0888 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM