Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Notation for Life-Threatening Allergy
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to ensure that the driver's license or identification card of an applicant who indicates on a certain application that the applicant has a life-threatening allergy includes a notation specifying that allergy; requiring an application for a driver's license or an identification card to allow an applicant to indicate that the applicant has a life-threatening allergy and specify the life-threatening allergy; and authorizing the Administration to adopt certain regulations.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Notation for Life-Threatening Allergy
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   12-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page