Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - County Clerk
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the duties of the County Clerk of Washington County; repealing a requirement that the County Clerk execute a specified bond before beginning the duties of the office; repealing requirements that each Washington County agency file with the County Clerk the names and addresses of all attorneys representing the agency and of all members of the agency who are attorneys; repealing requirements that the County Clerk maintain specified lists of names filed by each Washington County agency; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0793
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 45A
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-202, 3-602, 3-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM