Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts – Requirements for Appointment as a Notary Public – Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the date, to beginning October 1, 2021, by which initial and renewal applicants to be appointed as notaries public must complete certain requirements; requiring the Secretary of State, by October 1, 2021, to offer a course of study and an examination that cover the laws, regulations, procedures, and ethics relevant to notarial acts.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {216184/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (129-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Maryland Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts - Delay of Effective Date
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Maryland Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts - Delay of Effective Date
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 47
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {216184/1 Adopted 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (129-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts – Requirements for Appointment as a Notary Public – Alterations
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Text - Chapter - Maryland Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts – Requirements for Appointment as a Notary Public – Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:14 PM