Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education Member - Limitation on Candidacy for Other Elective Office
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (15-28)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a member of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education who vacates the office before the expiration of the term for which the member was appointed from being a candidate for election to a municipal, county, or State office before the conclusion of the term to which the member was appointed; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424536/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424536/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator King) Rejected (10-34)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (26-20)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Failed (15-28)
Proceedings
55
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments {424536/1 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments {424536/1 54
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Motion Recommit to Committee Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator King) Rejected (10-34) 54
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (26-20) 54
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Failed (15-28) 55
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM