Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Madaleno, Robinson, Rosapepe, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, on or before January 1, 2022, to require a candidate for a certificate to teach certain students to pass a test of research-based reading instruction; requiring the Board and the State Board of Education jointly to select the test and set the passing score for the test, subject to a certain condition; requiring the Board and the State Board jointly to set standards for the delivery of research-based reading instruction by teacher preparation programs in the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-704.2, 6-709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM