Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary and Compensation
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the annual salary of the State's Attorney for Anne Arundel County shall be specified amounts for specified calendar years; repealing a provision of law that requires a specified salary increase; providing that the State's Attorney is to be provided with a vehicle to use for official duties; providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the incumbent State's Attorney: etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0825
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0655 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688270/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {123723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {688270/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {123723/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 66
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM