Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Benson, Feldman, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain procedures for suspending or dismissing certain public school personnel; authorizing certain public school personnel to request a hearing before the county board or arbitration under certain circumstances; specifying the procedures for arbitration; assigning responsibility to the individual for 50% of the cost and expenses of the arbitration and 50% to the county board; providing that an arbitrator's decision and award is final and binding on the parties, subject to review by a circuit court; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1758
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-48)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Overridden (32-14)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate McMillan) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Overridden (89-49)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-48) 57
Post Passage 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Overridden (32-14) 62
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate McMillan) Adopted 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Overridden (89-49) 61
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13
Text - Chapter - Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM