Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Multifamily Adjustment and Deviation From Guidelines
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "adjusted actual income" under the State child support guidelines; providing for the calculation of a certain allowance required to be deducted from adjusted actual income under the child support guidelines; requiring that the amount of a certain allowance be subtracted from a parent's actual income before the court determines the amount of a child support award; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0279
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support - Multifamily Adjustment and Deviation From Guidelines
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child Support - Multifamily Adjustment and Deviation From Guidelines
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201, 12-202, 12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM