Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Extension of Termination Date
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Brochin, Forehand, Getty, Gladden, Muse, Raskin, Stone, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending to June 30, 2018, the termination date of provisions of law altering specified surcharges on specified fees, charges, and costs in civil cases in the circuit courts of the counties and the District Court and requiring a specified informational budget to be prepared for the Maryland Legal Services Corporation and submitted to the General Assembly.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0838
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {862410/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-33)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable with Amendments {862410/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-33) 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM