Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Ferguson, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a beverage distributor operating within the State to register with the Department of the Environment on or before April 1, 2014; requiring a redeemable beverage container sold in the State to bear specified information indicating a refund value of 5 cents beginning October 1, 2014; requiring the payment of specified deposits by specified distributors, retailers, and consumers under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1085
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1733 through 9-1741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM