Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kathleen A. Mathias Oral Chemotherapy Improvement Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Pugh, Raskin, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Middleton, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the scope of specified provisions of law relating to coverage of cancer chemotherapy to include specified policies or contracts issued or delivered by specified entities that provide essential health benefits required under specified provisions of federal law; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0625
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187677/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296786/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 2/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments {187677/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 41
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {296786/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 49
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 46
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Passed Enrolled 46
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-846 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM