Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "eligible populations" to allow funds from the Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership Fund to be used for services provided to drug offenders under the supervision of the problem solving courts; altering the information an applicant is required to include in an request for Partnership funding; authorizing a participating county, under specified circumstances, to use Partnership funding to continue or expand funding for eligible functions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207875/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {207875/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 45
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6C-01, 8-6C-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM