Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State to purchase a certain insurance policy to satisfy a bond requirement to protect certain losses of State Retirement and Pension System assets.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0844
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Appropriations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page