Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Early Identification of Autism Act
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to require health care practitioners, when providing a well-child examination at the ages of 18 months and 24 months, to administer a specified screening tool for autism; requiring the Secretary to require a child to be referred for specified services if the child has a positive result on the screening tool; requiring health insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for the administration of the screening tool; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0715
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2016 Text - First - Early Identification of Autism Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-2801, 13-2802 )
(   15-817.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM