Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Officials - Appointments - Advice and Consent of the Senate
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the State Board of Education shall appoint the State Superintendent of Schools with the advice and consent of the Senate; specifying the term of the State Superintendent; requiring an individual who holds the office of the State Administrator of Elections, beginning in 2023, to be subject to reappointment by the State Board of Elections with the advice and consent of the Senate at least once every 5 years after the initial appointment; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Officials - Appointments - Advice and Consent of the Senate
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Officials - Appointments - Advice and Consent of the Senate
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 4:53 PM
Click to return on the top page