Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Kasemeyer, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for certain decedents; altering a certain limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2019; providing that, for the calculation of the Maryland estate tax in the case of a certain decedent spouse, the applicable exclusion amount includes the sum of a certain exclusion amount and a certain deceased spousal unused exclusion amount; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0308
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {709133/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-49)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {709133/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-9) 46
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Ways and Means 45
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (90-49) 55
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Text - Chapter - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM