Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating specified findings of the General Assembly; declaring a specified policy of the State; prohibiting specified institutions of higher education from using funds for specified purposes; and requiring a specified reduction to State funds under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0998
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 17A
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/07/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/07/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-203.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM