Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Conway, Nathan-Pulliam, and Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions of law do not prohibit a licensed physician who complies with specified requirements from personally preparing and dispensing a prescription written by a physician assistant in accordance with a specified delegation agreement or a nurse practitioner who is authorized to practice under a specified provision of law and is working with the physician in the same office setting.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0752
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924033/1
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/29 (Senator Nathan-Pulliam) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {866989/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2016 2/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {924033/1 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Special Order until 2/29 (Senator Nathan-Pulliam) Adopted 32
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {866989/1 Report Adopted 54
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 55
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM