Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, for a development with 11 or more homes to be built by the same builder, a home builder to provide a purchaser with written information on energy-efficient options, including a statement that tax credits may be available related to the energy-efficient options, available for installation in a new home; and requiring a contract for the initial sale of a new home to contain a certain acknowledgment that the purchaser was provided with certain information about energy-efficient options for the home.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1481
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Text - Chapter - Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
(   14-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page